US HB929 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To provide that the amount of time that an elderly offender must serve before being eligible for placement in home detention is to be reduced by the amount of good time credits earned by the prisoner, and for other purposes.
Title
To provide that the amount of time that an elderly offender must serve before being eligible for placement in home detention is to be reduced by the amount of good time credits earned by the prisoner, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2021-02-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3669 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB312 (Related) 2021-06-08 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 68.
SB312 (Related) 2021-06-08 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 68.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/929/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr929/BILLS-117hr929ih.pdf |