US HB920 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-14 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 451.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-14 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 451.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Act entitled "Act to provide for the establishment of the Brown v. Board of Education National Historic Site in the State of Kansas, and for other purposes" to provide for inclusion of additional related sites in the National Park System, and for other purposes.
Title
Brown v. Board of Education National Historical Park Expansion and Redesignation Act
Sponsors
Rep. James Clyburn [D-SC] | Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Robert Good [R-VA] |
Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL] | Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] | Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] | Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] |
Rep. Nikema Williams [D-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-14 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 451. |
2022-12-14 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 117-627. |
2022-04-06 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2022-04-06 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-04-06 | House | Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Discharged. |
2021-04-21 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2021-03-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2021-02-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB270 (Same As) 2022-05-12 - Became Public Law No: 117-123.