US HB903 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 218-14)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-16 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-16 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To enhance the security operations of the Transportation Security Administration and stability of the transportation security workforce by applying the personnel system under title 5, United States Code, to employees of the Transportation Security Administration who provide screening of all passengers and property, and for other purposes.
Title
Rights for the TSA Workforce Act of 2022 Rights for the Transportation Security Administration Workforce Act of 2022
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-12 - House - On passage (Y: 220 N: 201 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-05-12 - House - On motion to recommit (Y: 205 N: 216 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2022-05-12 - House - On agreeing to the Thompson (MS) amendments (A002) H.Amdt.198 (Y: 215 N: 198 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2022-05-12 - House - On agreeing to the Guest amendment (A004) H.Amdt.200 (Y: 200 N: 221 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2022-05-12 - House - On agreeing to the Cammack amendment (A003) H.Amdt.199 (Y: 204 N: 216 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2022-05-12 - House - On motion to recommit (Y: 205 N: 216 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2022-05-12 - House - On agreeing to the Thompson (MS) amendments (A002) H.Amdt.198 (Y: 215 N: 198 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2022-05-12 - House - On agreeing to the Guest amendment (A004) H.Amdt.200 (Y: 200 N: 221 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2022-05-12 - House - On agreeing to the Cammack amendment (A003) H.Amdt.199 (Y: 204 N: 216 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
2022-05-12 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2022-05-12 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-05-12 | House | On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 220 - 201 (Roll no. 172). |
2022-05-12 | House | On motion to recommit Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 205 - 216 (Roll no. 171). |
2022-05-12 | House | The previous question on the motion to recommit was ordered pursuant to clause 2(b) of rule XIX. |
2022-05-12 | House | Mr. Gooden (TX) moved to recommit to the Committee on Homeland Security. (text: CR H4893-4894) |
2022-05-12 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. |
2022-05-12 | House | H.Amdt.200 On agreeing to the Guest amendment (A004) Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 200 - 221 (Roll no. 170). |
2022-05-12 | House | H.Amdt.199 On agreeing to the Cammack amendment (A003) Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 204 - 216 (Roll no. 169). |
2022-05-12 | House | H.Amdt.198 On agreeing to the Thompson (MS) amendments (A002) Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 215 - 198 (Roll no. 168). |
2022-05-12 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Guest amendment No. 5, the Chair put the question on adoption of the amendment and by voice vote, announced that the noes had prevailed. Mr. Guest demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be announced. |
2022-05-12 | House | H.Amdt.200 The previous question was ordered on the amendment (A004) pursuant to the rule. |
2022-05-12 | House | DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 1097, the House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Guest amendment No. 5. |
2022-05-12 | House | H.Amdt.200 Amendment (A004) offered by Mr. Guest. (consideration: CR H4890-4891, H4893; text: CR H4890) |
2022-05-12 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Cammack amendment No. 3, the Chair put the question on adoption of the amendment and by voice vote, announced that the noes had prevailed. Mrs. Cammack demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be announced. |
2022-05-12 | House | H.Amdt.199 The previous question was ordered on the amendment (A003) pursuant to the rule. |
2022-05-12 | House | DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 1097, the House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Cammack amendment No. 3. |
2022-05-12 | House | H.Amdt.199 Amendment (A003) offered by Mrs. Cammack. (consideration: CR H4889-4890, H4892-4893; text: CR H4889) |
2022-05-12 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Thompson (MS) amendment en bloc, the Chair put the question on adoption of the amendment and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Cloud demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be announced. |
2022-05-12 | House | H.Amdt.198 The previous question was ordered on the amendment (A002) pursuant to the rule. |
2022-05-12 | House | DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 1097, the House proceeded with 20 minutes of debate on the Thompson (MS) amendment en bloc. |
2022-05-12 | House | H.Amdt.198 Amendments en bloc (A002) offered by Mr. Thompson (MS). (consideration: CR H4887-4889, H4891-4892; text: CR H4887-4888) |
2022-05-12 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 903. |
2022-05-12 | House | Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 903, H.R. 2499, H.R. 5129 and H.R. 7691. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 903, H.R. 2499, and H.R. 5129 under a structured rule. H.R. 7691 is considered under a closed rule. Bills considered under the rule are debatable for one hour. The rule provides that H. Res. 1096 is adopted and amends H. Res. 188 by striking May 13, 2022 and inserting June 10, 2022. |
2022-05-12 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 1097. (consideration: CR H4878-4896) |
2022-05-10 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 1097 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 903, H.R. 2499, H.R. 5129 and H.R. 7691. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 903, H.R. 2499, and H.R. 5129 under a structured rule. H.R. 7691 is considered under a closed rule. Bills considered under the rule are debatable for one hour. The rule provides that H. Res. 1096 is adopted and amends H. Res. 188 by striking May 13, 2022 and inserting June 10, 2022. |
2022-05-06 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 230. |
2022-05-06 | House | Committee on Oversight and Reform discharged. |
2022-05-06 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 117-310, Part I. |
2021-07-28 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 19 - 11. |
2021-07-28 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-07-28 | House | Subcommittee on Transportation and Maritime Security Discharged. |
2021-05-04 | House | Committee Hearings Held. |
2021-02-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Transportation and Maritime Security. |
2021-02-05 | House | Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-02-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1856 (Related) 2021-05-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HR1097 (Related) 2022-05-10 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR1097 (Related) 2022-05-10 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.