US HB903 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 29-1)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
American Job Protection Act - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to repeal provisions added by the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act requiring certain employers who have a workforce of 50 or more full-time employees to provide health insurance coverage for their employees.
Title
American Job Protection Act
Sponsors
Rep. Charles Boustany [R-LA] | Rep. Mark Amodei [R-NV] | Rep. Lou Barletta [R-PA] | Rep. Garland Barr [R-KY] |
Rep. John Barrow [D-GA] | Rep. Dan Benishek [R-MI] | Rep. Diane Black [R-TN] | Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX] |
Rep. John Carter [R-TX] | Rep. Charles Dent [R-PA] | Rep. Tim Griffin [R-AR] | Rep. Jack Kingston [R-GA] |
Rep. John Kline [R-MN] | Rep. Kenny Marchant [R-TX] | Rep. Luke Messer [R-IN] | Rep. Robert Pittenger [R-NC] |
Rep. Ted Poe [R-TX] | Rep. Mike Pompeo [R-KS] | Rep. James Renacci [R-OH] | Rep. Reid Ribble [R-WI] |
Rep. David Roe [R-TN] | Rep. Peter Roskam [R-IL] | Rep. Keith Rothfus [R-PA] | Rep. Aaron Schock [R-IL] |
Rep. Pete Sessions [R-TX] | Rep. Patrick Tiberi [R-OH] | Rep. Tim Walberg [R-MI] | Rep. Lynn Westmoreland [R-GA] |
Rep. Kevin Yoder [R-KS] | Sen. Todd Young [R-IN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
Same As/Similar To
HB582 (Related) 2013-02-06 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB37 (Related) 2013-01-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB2674 (Related) 2013-09-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
HB37 (Related) 2013-01-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB2674 (Related) 2013-09-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
Subjects
Employee benefits and pensions
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Sales and excise taxes
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Sales and excise taxes
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/903/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr903/BILLS-113hr903ih.pdf |