US HB903 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Engrossed on September 29 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-09-29 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 29 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-09-29 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Dental Emergency Responder Act of 2010 - Amends the Public Health Service Act to authorize the inclusion of dental health facilities in the National Health Security Strategy for purposes of preparedness during public health emergencies. Includes dental entities among entities that may carry out education and training activities to improve responses to public health emergencies. Amends the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to: (1) define "emergency responder providers" to include federal, state, and local governmental and nongovernmental dental personnel, agencies, and authorities; and (2) require the Chief Medical Officer to serve as the Department of Homeland Security's (DHS) primary point of contact for the dental community, with respect to medical and public health matters. Amends the Post-Katrina Emergency Management Reform Act of 2006 to require operational plans developed under the National Response Plan to address the preparedness and deployment of dental resources.
Title
Dental Emergency Responder Act of 2010
Sponsors
Rep. Chaka Fattah [D-PA] | Rep. Phil Gingrey [R-GA] | Rep. Gene Green [D-TX] | Rep. Tim Holden [D-PA] |
Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Mary Kilroy [D-OH] | Rep. Christopher Lee [R-NY] | Rep. Thaddeus McCotter [R-MI] |
Rep. Candice Miller [R-MI] | Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ] | Rep. Mike J. Rogers [R-MI] | Rep. Steven Rothman [D-NJ] |
Rep. Zachary Space [D-OH] | Rep. Bart Stupak [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-29 | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. | |
2010-09-28 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2010-09-28 | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7197-7198) | |
2010-09-28 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 903. | |
2010-09-28 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7197-7199) | |
2010-09-28 | Mr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. | |
2010-09-28 | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 387. | |
2010-09-28 | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 111-647. | |
2010-07-28 | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. | |
2010-07-28 | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. | |
2010-07-22 | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote . | |
2010-07-22 | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. | |
2009-02-09 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. | |
2009-02-04 | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
Subjects
Dental care
Department of Homeland Security
Disaster relief and insurance
Emergency management
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Federal officials
Health facilities and institutions
Homeland security
Medical education
Terrorism
Department of Homeland Security
Disaster relief and insurance
Emergency management
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Federal officials
Health facilities and institutions
Homeland security
Medical education
Terrorism