US HB90 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-31 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-31 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Alters provisions relating to the requirement to maintain minimum essential health care coverage (i.e., the individual mandate), as well as provisions relating to health care coverage for certain executive branch and congressional employees. Specifically, the bill exempts individuals from the requirement to maintain minimum essential health care coverage if they reside in a county where fewer than two health insurers offer insurance on the health insurance exchange. (Under current law, effective January 1, 2019, there is no penalty for failing to maintain minimum essential health care coverage.) The bill also requires certain executive branch and congressional employees to participate in health insurance exchanges. Under current law, Members of Congress and their designated staff are required to obtain coverage through health insurance exchanges, rather than the Federal Employee Health Benefits (FEHB) Program. Current regulations authorize government contributions toward such coverage and require Members of Congress to designate which members of their staff are required to obtain coverage through an exchange. The bill requires all congressional staff, including employees of congressional committees and leadership offices, to obtain coverage through an exchange. The bill also prohibits Members of Congress from having the discretion to determine which of their employees are eligible to enroll through an exchange. Further, the President, Vice President, and executive branch political appointees must also obtain coverage through exchanges, rather than FEHB. The government is prohibited from contributing to or subsidizing the health insurance coverage of the officials and employees subject to this requirement, including Members of Congress and their staff.
Title
Protection from Obamacare Mandates and Congressional Equity Act
Sponsors
Rep. Andy Biggs [R-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-31 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-01-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-01-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, House Administration, and Oversight and Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-01-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, House Administration, and Oversight and Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-01-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, House Administration, and Oversight and Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-01-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, House Administration, and Oversight and Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Congressional committees
Congressional leadership
Congressional officers and employees
Federal officials
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government operations and politics
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Sales and excise taxes
Congressional leadership
Congressional officers and employees
Federal officials
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government operations and politics
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Sales and excise taxes
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/90/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr90/BILLS-116hr90ih.pdf |