US HB9 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 225-1)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 21.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Climate Action Now Act This bill requires the President to develop and update annually a plan for the United States to meet its nationally determined contribution under the Paris Agreement on climate change. Specifically, the plan must describe steps to (1) cut greenhouse gas emissions by 26%-28% below 2005 levels by 2025, and (2) confirm that other parties to the agreement with major economies are fulfilling their announced contributions. In addition, the bill prohibits federal funds from being used to withdraw from the agreement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Climate Action Now Act

Sponsors

Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL]Rep. Nancy Pelosi [D-CA]Rep. Nancy Pelosi [D-CA]Rep. Steny Hoyer [D-MD]
Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ]Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY]Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ]Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX]
Rep. Richard Neal [D-MA]Rep. James McGovern [D-MA]Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY]Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA]
Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR]Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA]Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA]Rep. Donald McEachin [D-VA]
Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO]Rep. Sean Casten [D-IL]Rep. Ben Lujan [D-NM]Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL]
Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL]Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA]Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA]Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA]
Rep. Robert Scott [D-VA]Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL]Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ]Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY]
Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ]Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA]Rep. Charlie Crist [D-FL]Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]
Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA]Rep. Harley Rouda [D-CA]Rep. Debbie Mucarsel-Powell [D-FL]Rep. Joseph Kennedy [D-MA]
Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN]Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA]Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY]Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT]
Rep. Lois Frankel [D-FL]Rep. Elijah Cummings [D-MD]Rep. Peter Welch [D-VT]Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA]
Rep. Jeff Van Drew [D-NJ]Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY]Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY]Rep. James Clyburn [D-SC]
Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA]Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA]Rep. Hakeem Jeffries [D-NY]Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA]
Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA]Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE]Rep. Max Rose [D-NY]Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]
Rep. Susan Davis [D-CA]Rep. Brendan Boyle [D-PA]Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA]Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA]
Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA]Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY]Rep. Andy Levin [D-MI]Rep. Lori Trahan [D-MA]
Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR]Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA]Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM]Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR]
Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA]Rep. C.A. Ruppersberger [D-MD]Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO]Rep. Kim Schrier [D-WA]
Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH]Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA]Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME]Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT]
Rep. William Keating [D-MA]Rep. John Sarbanes [D-MD]Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI]Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY]
Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ]Rep. Katie Hill [D-CA]Rep. John Yarmuth [D-KY]Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH]
Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA]Rep. Antonio Delgado [D-NY]Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA]Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS]
Rep. Jared Golden [D-ME]Rep. Denny Heck [D-WA]Rep. Donna Shalala [D-FL]Rep. Ami Bera [D-CA]
Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL]Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY]Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL]
Rep. Michael Doyle [D-PA]Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA]Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA]Rep. Marc Veasey [D-TX]
Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA]Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA]Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD]Rep. Kurt Schrader [D-OR]
Rep. Raja Krishnamoorthi [D-IL]Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN]Rep. Al Green [D-TX]Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI]
Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV]Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ]Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA]Rep. John Lewis [D-GA]
Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D-CT]Rep. Val Demings [D-FL]Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY]Rep. Katherine Clark [D-MA]
Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA]Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D-FL]Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL]Rep. Norma Torres [D-CA]
Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL]Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA]Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY]Rep. Ed Case [D-HI]
Rep. James Langevin [D-RI]Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA]Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA]Rep. Jennifer Wexton [D-VA]
Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA]Rep. David Price [D-NC]Rep. Sylvia Garcia [D-TX]Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI]
Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA]Rep. Ben McAdams [D-UT]Rep. David Loebsack [D-IA]Rep. Greg Stanton [D-AZ]
Rep. Lloyd Doggett [D-TX]Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL]Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY]Rep. Haley Stevens [D-MI]
Rep. John Larson [D-CT]Rep. Xochitl Torres Small [D-NM]Rep. David Trone [D-MD]Rep. Joe Cunningham [D-SC]
Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO]Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY]Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN]Rep. Peter Visclosky [D-IN]
Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA]Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA]Rep. James Himes [D-CT]Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA]
Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA]Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO]Rep. Joaquin Castro [D-TX]Rep. Donald Norcross [D-NJ]
Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ]Rep. Alma Adams [D-NC]Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL]Rep. G. Butterfield [D-NC]
Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA]Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA]Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI]Rep. Rebecca Sherrill [D-NJ]
Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA]Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA]Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ]Rep. Ayanna Pressley [D-MA]
Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI]Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN]Rep. Steven Horsford [D-NV]Rep. Al Lawson [D-FL]
Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA]Rep. Andy Kim [D-NJ]Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA]Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX]
Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA]Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA]Rep. Gregorio Sablan [I-MP]Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA]
Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA]Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA]Rep. David Scott [D-GA]Rep. Marcia Fudge [D-OH]
Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO]Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA]Rep. Colin Allred [D-TX]Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA]
Rep. Pete Aguilar [D-CA]Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL]Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL]Rep. Anthony Brindisi [D-NY]
Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL]Rep. Lucy McBath [D-GA]Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO]Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA]
Rep. Filemon Vela [D-TX]Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL]Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN]Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI]
Rep. TJ Cox [D-CA]Rep. Ann Kirkpatrick [D-AZ]Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL]Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI]
Rep. Suzanne Lee [D-NV]Rep. Alexandria Ocasio-Cortez [D-NY]Rep. Jimmy Gomez [D-CA]Rep. Brenda Lawrence [D-MI]
Rep. Abby Finkenauer [D-IA]Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH]Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI]Rep. Sharice Davids [D-KS]
Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA]Rep. Veronica Escobar [D-TX]Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL]Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY]
Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ]Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN]Rep. Cedric Richmond [D-LA]Rep. Jose Serrano [D-NY]
Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX]Rep. Maxine Waters [D-CA]Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA]Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ]
Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA]Rep. Luis Correa [D-CA]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 21.
2019-04-18HouseReported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-41, Part II.
2019-04-18HouseReported by the Committee on Foreign Affairs. H. Rept. 116-41, Part I.
2019-04-09HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-04-09HouseOrdered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 24 - 16.
2019-04-04HouseOrdered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 29 - 19.
2019-04-04HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-03-27HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-03-27HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-03-27HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback