US HB8966 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 22 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-10-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Pending: House Conservation and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 22 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-10-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Pending: House Conservation and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To clarify regulatory certainty, and for other purposes.
Title
START Act Simplify Timelines and Assure Regulatory Transparency Act
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Kelly [R-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry. |
2022-09-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment and Climate Change. |
2022-09-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment. |
2022-09-22 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2022-09-22 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB245 (Related) 2021-02-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment and Climate Change.
HB7654 (Related) 2022-05-03 - Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
SB2394 (Related) 2021-07-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB4815 (Related) 2022-09-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
HB7654 (Related) 2022-05-03 - Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
SB2394 (Related) 2021-07-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB4815 (Related) 2022-09-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/8966/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr8966/BILLS-117hr8966ih.pdf |