US HB8950 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on September 22 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-10-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit.
Pending: House Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 22 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-10-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit.
Pending: House Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Commodity Exchange Act to provide the Commodity Futures Trading Commission jurisdiction to oversee the spot digital commodity market, and for other purposes.
Title
Digital Commodities Consumer Protection Act of 2022
Sponsors
Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Stacey Plaskett [D-VI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit. |
2022-09-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture. |
2022-09-22 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB8730 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law.
SB4760 (Related) 2022-09-15 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
SB4760 (Related) 2022-09-15 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/8950/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr8950/BILLS-117hr8950ih.pdf |