US HB884 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-15 - Referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-15 - Referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To direct the Secretary of Transportation to establish a national aviation preparedness plan for communicable disease outbreaks, and for other purposes.
Title
National Aviation Preparedness Plan Act of 2022
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA] | Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA] | Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] | Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] | Rep. Kaialii Kahele [D-HI] | Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA] |
Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Ed Case [D-HI] | Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] |
Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL] | Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA] |
Roll Calls
2022-09-14 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended (Y: 293 N: 133 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-15 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
2022-11-15 | Senate | Senate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2022-09-19 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2022-09-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2022-09-14 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-09-14 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 293 - 133 (Roll no. 427). (text: 9/13/2022 CR H7752-7753) |
2022-09-14 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7822-7823) |
2022-09-13 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2022-09-13 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 884. |
2022-09-13 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7752-7753) |
2022-09-13 | House | Ms. Norton moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2022-09-13 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 355. |
2022-09-13 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 117-458. |
2022-07-20 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 57 - 2. |
2022-07-20 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-07-20 | House | Subcommittee on Aviation Discharged. |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation. |
2021-02-05 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2021-02-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2770 (Related) 2021-04-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.