US HB88 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-07 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Shiloh National Military Park Boundary Adjustment and Parker's Crossroads Battlefield Designation Act (Sec. 3) This bill modifies the boundary of Shiloh National Military Park in Tennessee and Mississippi to include the Fallen Timbers Battlefield, the Russell House Battlefield, and the Davis Bridge Battlefield. The Department of the Interior may acquire such lands, which shall be administered as part of the park. (Sec. 4) The bill establishes the Parker's Crossroads Battlefield in Tennessee as an affiliated area of the National Park System. The city of Parkers Crossroads and the Tennessee Historical Commission shall jointly be the management entity for such area. Interior may provide technical assistance and enter into cooperative agreements with such entity to financially assist with the marketing, marking, interpretation, and preservation of such area. Interior shall develop a general management plan for such area.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Shiloh National Military Park Boundary Adjustment and Parker's Crossroads Battlefield Designation Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-07SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2018-06-06SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
2018-06-06SenateThe committee substitute as amended agreed to by Unanimous Consent.
2018-06-06SenateS.Amdt.2349 Amendment SA 2349 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
2018-06-06SenateS.Amdt.2349 Amendment SA 2349 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Murkowski. (consideration: CR S3263; text: CR S3263) To modify the authorized methods for the acquisition of land to be added to the Shiloh National Military Park.
2018-06-06SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S3263, S3265; text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S3263)
2017-05-09SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 61.
2017-05-09SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-48.
2017-03-30SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
2017-02-28SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
2017-02-27HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2017-02-27HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1324-1325)
2017-02-27HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 88.
2017-02-27HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1324-1326)
2017-02-27HouseMr. McClintock moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2017-02-10HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
2017-01-03HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2017-01-03HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB100 (Related) 2017-01-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB2810 (Related) 2017-12-12 - Became Public Law No: 115-91. (TXT | PDF)
HR616 (Similar To) 2017-11-14 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB5515 (Related) 2018-08-13 - Became Public Law No: 115-232.
HR1019 (Similar To) 2018-07-24 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback