US HB878 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 75-1)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-30 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-30 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the tax deduction for certain expenses of elementary and secondary school teachers to (1) increase from $250 to $500 the annual limit on the expenses that may be deducted, and (2) require the limit to be adjusted for inflation after 2019.
Title
Educators Expense Deduction Modernization Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-30 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2019-01-30 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB5352 (Related) 2019-12-06 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB5377 (Related) 2020-01-03 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2510 (Related) 2019-09-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB5377 (Related) 2020-01-03 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2510 (Related) 2019-09-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/878/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr878/BILLS-116hr878ih.pdf |