US HB875 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on December 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-16 - Became Public Law No: 114-279.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Cross-Border Trade Enhancement Act of 2016 Authorizes the Commissioner of U.S. Customs and Border Protection (CBP) to enter into agreements with certain persons for the CBP to provide customs, agricultural processing, border security, or inspection-related immigration services at a land border port of entry, subject to payment of a fee to reimburse the CBP for providing such services. Authorizes the Commissioner and the Administrator of General Services (GSA) to: enter into cost-sharing or reimbursement agreements with persons for the construction or maintenance of a new or existing CBP or GSA facility or other infrastructure at a land border port of entry; or accept donations from persons of real or personal property (including money) or nonpersonal services for use in the construction or maintenance of such facilities or infrastructure. Directs the Commissioner to issue procedures for evaluating a proposal submitted by a person for an agreement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cross-Border Trade Enhancement Act of 2016

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-12-16SenateBecame Public Law No: 114-279.
2016-12-16SenateSigned by President.
2016-12-14SenatePresented to President.
2016-12-12SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2016-12-10SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7149)
2016-12-07SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
2016-12-06HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2016-12-06HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7215-7218)
2016-12-06HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 875.
2016-12-06HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7215-7220)
2016-12-06HouseMr. Boustany moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2015-03-16HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
2015-02-27HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
2015-02-27HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research.
2015-02-25HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security.
2015-02-12HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
2015-02-11HouseReferred to House Agriculture
2015-02-11HouseReferred to House Homeland Security
2015-02-11HouseReferred to House Judiciary
2015-02-11HouseReferred to House Transportation and Infrastructure
2015-02-11HouseReferred to House Ways and Means
2015-02-11HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, the Judiciary, Homeland Security, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2015-02-11HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB208 (Related) 2015-01-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
SB461 (Same As) 2016-11-30 - Held at the desk.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback