US HB872 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-5)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Pending: House Conservation and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

WILD Act Wildlife Innovation and Longevity Driver Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

WILD Act Wildlife Innovation and Longevity Driver Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-25HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
2019-02-07HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation.
2019-02-07HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
2019-01-30HouseReferred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Science, Space, and Technology, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-01-30HouseReferred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Science, Space, and Technology, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-01-30HouseReferred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Science, Space, and Technology, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-01-30HouseReferred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Science, Space, and Technology, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-01-30HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB268 (Same As) 2019-03-26 - By Senator Barrasso from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 116-18.
SB47 (Related) 2019-03-12 - Became Public Law No: 116-9.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback