US HB872 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-09-29 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-09-29 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To extend Federal recognition to the Chickahominy Indian Tribe, the Chickahominy Indian Tribe-Eastern Division, the Upper Mattaponi Tribe, the Rappahannock Tribe, Inc., the Monacan Indian Nation, and the Nansemond Indian Tribe. Extends federal recognition to the following Indian tribes of Virginia and establishes their relationship with the federal government as described below: (1) the Chickahominy Tribe, (2) the Chickahominy Indian Tribe--Eastern Division, (3) the Upper Mattaponi Tribe, (4) the Rappahannock Tribe, Inc., (5) the Monacan Indian Nation, and (6) the Nansemond Indian Tribe. Makes the tribes and their members eligible for all services and benefits provided by the federal government to federally recognized Indian tribes. Establishes the service area of each tribe and requirements for each tribe regarding its membership roll, governing documents, and governing body. Requires the Department of the Interior, on request of any of the tribes, to take specified lands into trust for the benefit of that tribe, to be considered part of that tribe's reservation. Prohibits the tribes from conducting gaming activities. Prohibits this Act from affecting the hunting, fishing, trapping, gathering, or water rights of the tribes and their members. Prohibits the use of eminent domain to acquire lands in fee or in trust for an Indian tribe recognized under this Act.
Title
To extend Federal recognition to the Chickahominy Indian Tribe, the Chickahominy Indian Tribe-Eastern Division, the Upper Mattaponi Tribe, the Rappahannock Tribe, Inc., the Monacan Indian Nation, and the Nansemond Indian Tribe.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Robert Scott [D-VA] | Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA] |
Rep. Scott Rigell [R-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-29 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2015-03-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs. |
2015-02-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2015-02-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB465 (Same As) 2015-09-10 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 221.
Subjects
Federal-Indian relations
Gambling
Indian lands and resources rights
Indian social and development programs
Land transfers
Native Americans
Property rights
Virginia
Gambling
Indian lands and resources rights
Indian social and development programs
Land transfers
Native Americans
Property rights
Virginia
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/872/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr872/BILLS-114hr872ih.pdf |