US HB8695 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Introduced on August 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-08-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Transportation and Maritime Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Transportation and Maritime Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-08-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Transportation and Maritime Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Transportation and Maritime Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Bottles and Breastfeeding Equipment Screening Act to require hygienic handling of breast milk and baby formula by security screening personnel of the Transportation Security Administration and personnel of private security companies providing security screening, and for other purposes.
Title
Bottles and Breastfeeding Equipment Screening Enhancement Act
Sponsors
Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA] | Rep. Maria Salazar [R-FL] | Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA] | Rep. Ashley Hinson [R-IA] |
Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Transportation and Maritime Security. |
2022-08-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
2022-08-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB4882 (Related) 2022-11-28 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 567.
SB4880 (Related) 2022-09-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB4880 (Related) 2022-09-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/8695/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr8695/BILLS-117hr8695ih.pdf |