US HB867 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Metal Theft Prevention Act of 2013 - Prohibits stealing specified metal being used in or affecting interstate or foreign commerce, the theft of which harms critical infrastructure, including metal used as part of an electrical substation, power line, cellular tower, telephone land line, highway equipment and facilities, railroad equipment and facilities, water well, reservoir, or sewage line. Sets penalties of a fine, 10 years' imprisonment, or both, for violations. Defines "specified metal" to include metal that is: (1) marked with the name, logo, or initials of a city, county, state, or federal government entity, a railroad, an electric, gas, or water company, a telephone company, a cable company, a retail establishment, or a public utility; (2) part of certain infrastructure items, such as a street light pole, guard rail, storm water grate, or grave marker; (3) a wire or cable commonly used by communications and electrical utilities; or (4) copper, aluminum, and other metal that is valuable for recycling or reuse as raw metal (except for aluminum cans). Prohibits a recycling agent from purchasing such metal: (1) unless the seller provides documentation of ownership of, or other proof of the authority of the seller to sell, such metal and there is a reasonable basis to believe that the documentation provided is valid (does not require the agent to independently verify such validity); or (2) that the agent knows, or has a reasonable basis to believe, to be stolen. Subjects violators to a civil penalty of up to $10,000 per violation. Sets forth recycling agent record-keeping and confidentiality requirements. Prohibits a recycling agent from paying cash for a single purchase of such metal of more than $100. Considers more than 1 purchase in any 48-hour period from the same seller to be a single purchase. Exempts from such documentation requirements or purchase limits any recycling agent that is subject to a state or local law that requires obtaining such documentation or that limits such purchases. Authorizes specified enforcement actions by the Attorney General and state attorneys general or equivalent state regulators. Directs the U.S. Sentencing Commission to review and amend the Federal Sentencing Guidelines and policy statements applicable to a person convicted of the theft of such metal.
Title
Metal Theft Prevention Act of 2013
Sponsors
Rep. Erik Paulsen [R-MN] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. John Kline [R-MN] | Rep. Aaron Schock [R-IL] |
Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations. |
2013-03-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Commerce, Manufacturing, and Trade. |
2013-02-27 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2013-02-27 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2013-02-27 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
SB394 (Same As) 2013-06-17 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 88.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Business records
Civil actions and liability
Crime and law enforcement
Crimes against property
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Electric power generation and transmission
Infrastructure development
Metals
Railroads
Roads and highways
Solid waste and recycling
U.S. Sentencing Commission
Water storage
Water use and supply
Business records
Civil actions and liability
Crime and law enforcement
Crimes against property
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Electric power generation and transmission
Infrastructure development
Metals
Railroads
Roads and highways
Solid waste and recycling
U.S. Sentencing Commission
Water storage
Water use and supply
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/867/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr867/BILLS-113hr867ih.pdf |