US HB866 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-07 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Fairness For Breastfeeding Mothers Act of 2019 (Sec. 2) This bill requires that certain public buildings that are open to the public and contain a public restroom provide a lactation room, other than a bathroom, that is hygienic and is available for use by members of the public to express milk. The lactation room must be shielded from public view, be free from intrusion, and contain a chair, a working surface, and (if the building is supplied with electricity) an electrical outlet. A public building may be excluded from such requirement at the discretion of the official responsible for its operation if it does not contain a lactation room for employees and does not have a space that could be repurposed as one or that could be made private by using portable materials, at a reasonable cost; or the cost of new construction required to create a lactation room is not feasible.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fairness For Breastfeeding Mothers Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-07SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
2019-02-06HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-02-06HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1371)
2019-02-06HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 866.
2019-02-06HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1371-1372)
2019-02-06HouseMs. Norton moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2019-01-30HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
2019-01-30HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E111)
2019-01-30HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB528 (Related) 2019-02-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback