US HB857 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 3 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

California Off-Road Recreation and Conservation Act This bill amends the California Desert Protection Act of 1994 to, among other things: establish or designate wilderness areas, off-highway vehicle recreation areas, and a national scenic area; release specified wilderness study areas; adjust national park and preserve boundaries; and specify land withdrawals and conveyances. Specified federal land shall be taken into trust for the Lone Pine Paiute-Shoshone Tribe. Lands and interests in land, including improvements, outside the boundary of Joshua Tree National Park in California, may be acquired for the purpose of operating a visitor center. The bill makes amendments to the California Desert Protection Act of 1994 regarding the California State School lands. The bill amends the Wild and Scenic Rivers Act to designate specified segments of rivers and creeks as components of the National Wild and Scenic Rivers System.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Off-Road Recreation and Conservation Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-16HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
2018-05-16HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2018-05-16HouseSubcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs Discharged.
2018-05-16HouseSubcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged.
2018-02-06HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2017-02-16HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
2017-02-16HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs.
2017-02-03HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2017-02-03HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB32 (Related) 2017-07-26 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback