US HB842 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 211-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the National Labor Relations Act, the Labor Management Relations Act, 1947, and the Labor-Management Reporting and Disclosure Act of 1959, and for other purposes.
Title
Protecting the Right to Organize Act of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-09 - House - On passage (Y: 225 N: 206 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - On motion to recommit (Y: 206 N: 218 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2021-03-09 - House - On agreeing to the Scott (VA) amendments (A003) H.Amdt.26 (Y: 185 N: 243 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-03-09 - House - On agreeing to the Scott (VA) amendments (A002) H.Amdt.25 (Y: 227 N: 196 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - On motion to recommit (Y: 206 N: 218 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2021-03-09 - House - On agreeing to the Scott (VA) amendments (A003) H.Amdt.26 (Y: 185 N: 243 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-03-09 - House - On agreeing to the Scott (VA) amendments (A002) H.Amdt.25 (Y: 227 N: 196 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
2021-03-09 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2021-03-09 | House | On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 225 - 206 (Roll no. 70). |
2021-03-09 | House | On motion to recommit Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 206 - 218 (Roll no. 69). |
2021-03-09 | House | The previous question on the motion to recommit was ordered pursuant to clause 2(b) of rule XIX. |
2021-03-09 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. |
2021-03-09 | House | Mr. Banks moved to recommit to the Committee on Education and Labor. (text: CR H1176-1177) |
2021-03-09 | House | H.Amdt.26 On agreeing to the Scott (VA) amendments (A003) Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 185 - 243 (Roll no. 68). |
2021-03-09 | House | H.Amdt.25 On agreeing to the Scott (VA) amendments (A002) Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 227 - 196 (Roll no. 67). |
2021-03-09 | House | UNFINISHED BUSINESS - The Chair announced that the unfinished business was the question on agreeing to the amendments which had been debated earlier and on which further proceedings had been postponed. |
2021-03-09 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1174-1178) |
2021-03-09 | House | Pursuant to clause 1(c) of Rule XIX, the House resumed further consideration of H.R. 842. |
2021-03-09 | House | Pursuant to clause 1(c) of Rule XIX, further consideration of H.R.842 is postponed. |
2021-03-09 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Scott (VA) amendment en bloc No. 2, the Chair put the question on agreeing to the amendment and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Ms. Foxx demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be announced. |
2021-03-09 | House | H.Amdt.26 The previous question was ordered on the amendment (A003) pursuant to the rule. |
2021-03-09 | House | DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 188, the House proceeded with 20 minutes of debate on the Scott (VA) amendment en bloc No. 2. |
2021-03-09 | House | H.Amdt.26 Amendments en bloc (A003) offered by Mr. Scott (VA). (consideration: CR H1160-1163, H1175-1176; text: CR H1160-1161) |
2021-03-09 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Scott (VA) amendment en bloc No. 1, the Chair put the question on agreeing to the amendment and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Ms. Foxx demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be announced. |
2021-03-09 | House | H.Amdt.25 The previous question was ordered on the amendment (A002) pursuant to the rule. |
2021-03-09 | House | DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 188, the House proceeded with 20 minutes of debate on the Scott (VA) amendment en bloc No. 1. |
2021-03-09 | House | H.Amdt.25 Amendments en bloc (A002) offered by Mr. Scott (VA). (consideration: CR H1154-1160, H1174-1175; text: CR H1154-1156) |
2021-03-09 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 842. |
2021-03-09 | House | Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 842, H.R. 8 and H.R. 1446. Rule provides for one hour of general debate for H.R. 842, H.R. 8, and H.R. 1446. The rule provides for a motion to recommit on H.R. 842, H.R. 8, and H.R. 1446. |
2021-03-09 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 188. (consideration: CR H1134-1163; text: CR H1134-1137) |
2021-03-08 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 188 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 842, H.R. 8 and H.R. 1446. Rule provides for one hour of general debate for H.R. 842, H.R. 8, and H.R. 1446. The rule provides for a motion to recommit on H.R. 842, H.R. 8, and H.R. 1446. |
2021-02-04 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor. |
2021-02-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR188 (Related) 2021-03-08 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB420 (Same As) 2022-06-22 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
HB8935 (Related) 2022-09-21 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
SB420 (Same As) 2022-06-22 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
HB8935 (Related) 2022-09-21 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.