US HB841 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition, Oversight, and Department Operations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Nutrition, Oversight, and Department Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

People CARE Act People-Centered Assistance Reform Effort Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

People CARE Act People-Centered Assistance Reform Effort Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-14HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition, Oversight, and Department Operations.
2019-02-12HouseReferred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
2019-02-07HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
2019-02-07HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
2019-01-29HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, Agriculture, Natural Resources, Energy and Commerce, Financial Services, Transportation and Infrastructure, Rules, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-01-29HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, Agriculture, Natural Resources, Energy and Commerce, Financial Services, Transportation and Infrastructure, Rules, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-01-29HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, Agriculture, Natural Resources, Energy and Commerce, Financial Services, Transportation and Infrastructure, Rules, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-01-29HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, Agriculture, Natural Resources, Energy and Commerce, Financial Services, Transportation and Infrastructure, Rules, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-01-29HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, Agriculture, Natural Resources, Energy and Commerce, Financial Services, Transportation and Infrastructure, Rules, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-01-29HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, Agriculture, Natural Resources, Energy and Commerce, Financial Services, Transportation and Infrastructure, Rules, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-01-29HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, Agriculture, Natural Resources, Energy and Commerce, Financial Services, Transportation and Infrastructure, Rules, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-01-29HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, Agriculture, Natural Resources, Energy and Commerce, Financial Services, Transportation and Infrastructure, Rules, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-01-29HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, Agriculture, Natural Resources, Energy and Commerce, Financial Services, Transportation and Infrastructure, Rules, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-01-29HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H1253)
2019-01-29HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects

Adoption and foster care
Adult day care
Advisory bodies
Aging
Child care and development
Child health
Congressional operations and organization
Economic development
Economics and public finance
Education of the disadvantaged
Education programs funding
Elementary and secondary education
Employment and training programs
Energy assistance for the poor and aged
Family planning and birth control
Food assistance and relief
Government studies and investigations
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health programs administration and funding
Higher education
Homelessness and emergency shelter
Housing and community development funding
Housing finance and home ownership
Housing for the elderly and disabled
Immigrant health and welfare
Income tax credits
Indian social and development programs
Lawyers and legal services
Legislative rules and procedure
Low- and moderate-income housing
Medicaid
Migrant, seasonal, agricultural labor
Minority health
National and community service
Nutrition and diet
Performance measurement
Poverty and welfare assistance
Public housing
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Rural conditions and development
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Student aid and college costs
Telecommunication rates and fees
Wages and earnings
Women's health
Youth employment and child labor

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback