US HB8405 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on November 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-30 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-30 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of State to distribute specified briefing materials to individuals representing the United States at international athletic competitions. These materials must contain information on human rights concerns and personal privacy and security risks posed by certain host countries (e.g., specified communist countries and countries that do not meet certain minimum standards with respect to human trafficking and are not making significant efforts to do so).
Title
American Values and Security in International Athletics Act
Sponsors
Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] | Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] | Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA] |
Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2020-11-18 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-11-18 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5913-5914) |
2020-11-18 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 8405. |
2020-11-18 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5913-5915) |
2020-11-18 | House | Mr. Espaillat moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2020-10-01 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2020-10-01 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-09-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2020-09-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Afghanistan
Africa
Algeria
Asia
Athletes
Belarus
Burma
Burundi
Caribbean area
China
Comoros
Congressional oversight
Cuba
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Eritrea
Europe
Human rights
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
International affairs
Iran
Latin America
Lesotho
Middle East
Nicaragua
North Korea
Oceania
Olympic games
Papua New Guinea
Right of privacy
Russia
South Sudan
Syria
Tibet
Turkmenistan
Venezuela
Vietnam
Africa
Algeria
Asia
Athletes
Belarus
Burma
Burundi
Caribbean area
China
Comoros
Congressional oversight
Cuba
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Eritrea
Europe
Human rights
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
International affairs
Iran
Latin America
Lesotho
Middle East
Nicaragua
North Korea
Oceania
Olympic games
Papua New Guinea
Right of privacy
Russia
South Sudan
Syria
Tibet
Turkmenistan
Venezuela
Vietnam