US HB8380 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on July 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-14 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-14 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To provide for the settlement of claims relating to the Shab-eh-nay Band Reservation in Illinois, and for other purposes.
Title
Prairie Band Potawatomi Nation Shab-eh-nay Band Reservation Settlement Act of 2022
Sponsors
Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL] | Rep. Lauren Underwood [D-IL] | Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL] | Rep. Jacob Laturner [R-KS] |
Rep. Marie Newman [D-IL] | Rep. Tracey Mann [R-KS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-14 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2022-07-20 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States. |
2022-07-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2022-07-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3242 (Related) 2021-11-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/8380/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr8380/BILLS-117hr8380ih.pdf |