US HB835 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To update the map of, and modify the maximum acreage available for inclusion in, the Florissant Fossil Beds National Monument. This bill revises the title, number, and date of the map depicting the Florissant Fossil Beds National Monument in Colorado and increases from 6,000 to 6,300 the maximum number of acres that may be made available for inclusion in the monument.
Title
To update the map of, and modify the maximum acreage available for inclusion in, the Florissant Fossil Beds National Monument.
Sponsors
Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO] | Rep. Jared Polis [D-CO] | Rep. Scott Tipton [R-CO] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-19 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill RC# 115 (Y: 385 N: 3 NV: 41 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2018-03-19 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-03-19 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 385 - 3 (Roll no. 115). (text: CR H1677) |
2018-03-19 | House | Considered as unfinished business. |
2018-03-19 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2018-03-19 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 835. |
2018-03-19 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1677-1679) |
2018-03-19 | House | Mr. Lamborn moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2018-02-26 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 441. |
2018-02-26 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-580. |
2018-02-14 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-02-14 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-02-14 | House | Subcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged. |
2018-02-06 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2017-02-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2017-02-02 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2017-02-02 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB287 (Same As) 2017-05-03 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 52.
Subjects
Colorado
Earth sciences
Land transfers
Monuments and memorials
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Earth sciences
Land transfers
Monuments and memorials
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats