US HB8316 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To require reports, evaluations, and research by the Department of Homeland Security regarding drug interdiction along the border, and for other purposes.
Title
Securing America’s Borders Against Fentanyl Act
Sponsors
Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA] | Rep. Andrew Garbarino [R-NY] | Rep. Jay Obernolte [R-CA] | Rep. Pat Ryan [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship. |
2022-11-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2022-07-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Cybersecurity, Infrastructure Protection, and Innovation. |
2022-07-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Border Security, Facilitation, and Operations. |
2022-07-07 | House | Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committees on Oversight and Reform, Energy and Commerce, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2022-07-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB5052 (Related) 2022-09-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB7776 (Related) 2022-12-23 - Became Public Law No: 117-263.
HB7776 (Related) 2022-12-23 - Became Public Law No: 117-263.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/8316/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr8316/BILLS-117hr8316ih.pdf |