US HB829 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-6)
Status: Passed on August 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-21 - Became Public Law No: 116-44. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-6)
Status: Passed on August 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-21 - Became Public Law No: 116-44. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 1450 Montauk Highway in Mastic, New York, as the "Army Specialist Thomas J. Wilwerth Post Office Building."
Title
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 1450 Montauk Highway in Mastic, New York, as the "Army Specialist Thomas J. Wilwerth Post Office Building".
Sponsors
Rep. Lee Zeldin [R-NY] | Rep. Peter King [R-NY] | Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY] | Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY] |
Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY] | Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY] | Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY] | Rep. Hakeem Jeffries [D-NY] |
Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] | Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] | Rep. Max Rose [D-NY] | Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY] |
Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY] | Rep. Alexandria Ocasio-Cortez [D-NY] | Rep. Jose Serrano [D-NY] | Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY] |
Rep. Nita Lowey [D-NY] | Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Antonio Delgado [D-NY] | Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] |
Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY] | Rep. Anthony Brindisi [D-NY] | Rep. Tom Reed [R-NY] | Rep. John Katko [R-NY] |
Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY] | Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY] | Rep. Chris Collins [R-NY] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-04 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill RC# 151 (Y: 423 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-21 | House | Became Public Law No: 116-44. (TXT | PDF) |
2019-08-21 | House | Signed by President. |
2019-08-13 | House | Presented to President. |
2019-07-31 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2019-07-30 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5204) |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 89. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. Without written report. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2019-04-04 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-04-04 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 423 - 0 (Roll no. 151). (text: CR 4/2/2019 H2970) |
2019-04-04 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3080-3081) |
2019-04-02 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Connolly objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was considered as withdrawn. |
2019-04-02 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 829. |
2019-04-02 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2970-2971) |
2019-04-02 | House | Mr. Connolly moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-03-26 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-03-26 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform. |
2019-01-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Congressional tributes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Military personnel and dependents
New York State
Postal service
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Military personnel and dependents
New York State
Postal service