US HB8263 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service, to ensure opportunities for participation by the Department of Defense in wildlife conservation banking programs, to issue regulations that establish objectives, measurable performance standards, and criteria for use with respect to such programs. Mitigation banking is a method of offsetting the effects of development on a species, or habitat of such species, that is endangered, threatened, or otherwise at risk. The bill requires the regulatory standards and criteria, to the extent practicable, to maximize available credits and opportunities for mitigation, provide flexibility for characteristics of various species, and apply equivalent standards and criteria to all mitigation banks.
Title
To ensure opportunities for Department of Defense participation in wildlife conservation banking programs, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA] | Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife. |
2020-09-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2020-09-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB6395 (Related) 2021-01-02 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
HR1271 (Related) 2020-12-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR1271 (Related) 2020-12-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Defense spending
Department of the Interior
Endangered and threatened species
Land use and conservation
Performance measurement
Public lands and natural resources
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Defense spending
Department of the Interior
Endangered and threatened species
Land use and conservation
Performance measurement
Public lands and natural resources
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/8263/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr8263/BILLS-116hr8263ih.pdf |