US HB8260 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-13)
Status: Passed on December 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-27 - Became Public Law No: 117-313.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-13)
Status: Passed on December 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-27 - Became Public Law No: 117-313.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 38, United States Code, to shorten the timeframe for designation of benefits under Department of Veterans Affairs life insurance programs, to improve the treatment of undisbursed life insurance benefits by the Department of Veterans Affairs, and for other purposes.
Title
Faster Payments to Veterans' Survivors Act of 2022
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-27 | House | Became Public Law No: 117-313. |
2022-12-27 | House | Signed by President. |
2022-12-23 | House | Presented to President. |
2022-12-20 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2022-12-19 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7302) |
2022-09-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2022-09-14 | House | Pursuant to section 11 of H. Res. 1339, and the motion offered by Mr. Hoyer, the following bills passed under suspension of the rules: H.R. 1468, as amended; H.R. 5865; H.R. 5916, as amended; H.R. 7735, as amended; H.R. 7846; H.R. 7939, as amended; H.R. 8260, as amended; and S. 4205. (consideration: CR H7814-7822; text: CR H7820-7821) |
2022-09-14 | House | Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 1339, proceedings on H.R. 8260 are considered vacated. |
2022-09-13 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2022-09-13 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 8260. |
2022-09-13 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7770-7772; text: CR H7770-7771) |
2022-09-13 | House | Mr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2022-09-13 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 360. |
2022-09-13 | House | Reported by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 117-463. |
2022-07-19 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2022-07-19 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-07-18 | House | Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations Discharged. |
2022-07-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations. |
2022-07-01 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2022-07-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR1339 (Related) 2022-09-14 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB4646 (Related) 2022-07-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
SB4646 (Related) 2022-07-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.