US HB8259 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-4)
Status: Engrossed on November 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-30 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-30 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the use of federal funds to support or facilitate Russia's participation in a proceeding of the Group of Seven (a group consisting of the seven largest major advanced economies, as determined by the International Monetary Fund) or to reconstitute the Group of Eight to include Russia. (Russia was disinvited from the Group of Eight in 2014 after it occupied parts of Ukraine, including the Crimea region.) This prohibition shall terminate after the Department of State and the Office of the Director of National Intelligence certify that Russia has halted all interference into the elections of certain countries, including the United States and other North Atlantic Treaty Organization (NATO) member states; the State Department certifies that Russia has ended its occupation of Crimea and certain parts of Georgia; and the State Department certifies that Russia is complying with its commitments and taking specified actions related to these areas.
Title
To prohibit Russian participation in the G7, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. William Keating [D-MA] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] |
Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH] | Rep. David Trone [D-MD] | Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] |
Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] | Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO] |
Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] | Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY] | Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] | Rep. Ami Bera [D-CA] |
Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] | Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2020-11-18 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-11-18 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5907) |
2020-11-18 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 8259. |
2020-11-18 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5907-5909) |
2020-11-18 | House | Mr. Espaillat moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2020-10-01 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2020-10-01 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-09-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2020-09-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Afghanistan
Alliances
Appropriations
Asia
Conflicts and wars
Congressional oversight
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Europe
Foreign aid and international relief
Georgia (Republic)
Government studies and investigations
International affairs
International law and treaties
International organizations and cooperation
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Military personnel and dependents
Militias and paramilitary groups
Moldova
Russia
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Subversive activities
Ukraine
Alliances
Appropriations
Asia
Conflicts and wars
Congressional oversight
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Europe
Foreign aid and international relief
Georgia (Republic)
Government studies and investigations
International affairs
International law and treaties
International organizations and cooperation
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Military personnel and dependents
Militias and paramilitary groups
Moldova
Russia
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Subversive activities
Ukraine