US HB8258 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-08-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Pending: House Conservation and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-08-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Pending: House Conservation and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To provide exceptions from permitting and fee requirements for content creation, regardless of distribution platform, including still photography, digital or analog video, and digital or analog audio recording activities, conducted on land under the jurisdiction of the Secretary of Agriculture and the Secretary of the Interior, and for other purposes.
Title
Federal Interior Land Media Act FILM Act
Sponsors
Rep. Russ Fulcher [R-ID] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry. |
2022-07-14 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2022-07-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2022-07-01 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2022-07-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3266 (Related) 2022-09-21 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 501.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/8258/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr8258/BILLS-117hr8258ih.pdf |