US HB8254 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-28 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 301.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-28 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 301.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Making appropriations for Financial Services and General Government for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2023, and for other purposes.
Title
Judiciary Appropriations Act, 2023 Executive Office of the President Appropriations Act, 2023 District of Columbia Appropriations Act, 2023 Department of the Treasury Appropriations Act, 2023
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-28 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 301. |
2022-06-28 | House | The House Committee on Appropriations reported an original measure, H. Rept. 117-393, by Mr. Quigley. |
2022-06-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB4685 (Related) 2022-07-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
HB8294 (Related) 2022-07-26 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
HB8294 (Related) 2022-07-26 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/8254/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr8254/BILLS-117hr8254rh.pdf |