US HB825 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 63-10)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution And Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution And Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
United States-Israel Trade and Commercial Enhancement Act This bill states that among the principal U.S. trade negotiating objectives for trade agreements with foreign countries regarding commercial partnerships are to: discourage actions by potential trading partners that discourage commercial activity solely between the United States and Israel; discourage politically motivated actions to boycott, divest from, or sanction Israel and to seek the elimination of politically motivated non-tariff barriers on Israeli commerce; and seek the elimination of state-sponsored unsanctioned foreign boycotts against Israel or compliance with the Arab League Boycott of Israel. The President is directed to report annually to Congress on politically motivated acts of boycott, divestment from, and sanctions against Israel. The Securities Exchange Act of 1934 is amended to require a foreign issuer traded on the U.S. stock market to disclose in its quarterly or annual report: whether the issuer has discriminated against doing business with Israel in the last calendar year; whether the issuer has been advised by a foreign government or a non-member state of the United Nations (U.N.) to discriminate against doing business with Israel, entities owned or controlled by Israel, or entities operating in Israel or Israeli-controlled territory; and any instances where the issuer has learned that a person, foreign government, or a non-member state of the U.N. is boycotting the issuer, divesting itself of an ownership interest in the issuer, or placing sanctions on the issuer because of the issuer's relationship with Israel. No U.S. court may recognize or enforce any judgment by a foreign court against a U.S. person carrying out business operations in Israel or in any territory controlled by Israel, and on which is based a determination by the foreign court that the location in Israel, or in any territory controlled by Israel, of the facilities at which the business operations are carried out is sufficient to constitute a violation of law.
Title
United States-Israel Trade and Commercial Enhancement Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice. |
2015-02-10 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2015-02-10 | House | Referred to House Financial Services |
2015-02-10 | House | Referred to House Foreign Affairs |
2015-02-10 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2015-02-10 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, Financial Services, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-02-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB619 (Related) 2015-03-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB1907 (Related) 2015-05-14 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 80.
HB1907 (Related) 2015-05-14 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 80.
Subjects
Arab-Israeli relations
Business records
Civil actions and liability
Competitiveness, trade promotion, trade deficits
Congressional oversight
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Foreign and international corporations
Gaza Strip
International affairs
International law and treaties
International organizations and cooperation
Israel
Judicial procedure and administration
Middle East
Palestinians
Public contracts and procurement
Sanctions
Securities
State and local government operations
Trade agreements and negotiations
Trade restrictions
U.S. and foreign investments
West Bank
Business records
Civil actions and liability
Competitiveness, trade promotion, trade deficits
Congressional oversight
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Foreign and international corporations
Gaza Strip
International affairs
International law and treaties
International organizations and cooperation
Israel
Judicial procedure and administration
Middle East
Palestinians
Public contracts and procurement
Sanctions
Securities
State and local government operations
Trade agreements and negotiations
Trade restrictions
U.S. and foreign investments
West Bank
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/825/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr825/BILLS-114hr825ih.pdf |