US HB817 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Extends the Cape Cod National Seashore Advisory Commission through September 25, 2028.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To extend the authorization for the Cape Cod National Seashore Advisory Commission.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-01HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
2021-02-04HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2021-02-04HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB803 (Related) 2021-03-02 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback