US HB8161 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-09 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-09 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes grants to connect offenders transitioning from prisons or jails to the community with local reentry services. The Department of Justice (DOJ) may award grants to community-based nonprofits for community reentry centers. The centers must provide comprehensive services tailored to meet the needs of individuals returning to a particular community. These services may include, for example, help with finding employment and applying for public benefits. Additionally, DOJ must evaluate this program. DOJ may also award grants to states and localities for toll-free hotlines that direct callers to local reentry services. DOJ must also develop best practices for setting up these hotlines.
Title
The One Stop Shop Community Reentry Program Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA] | Rep. Guy Reschenthaler [R-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-09 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
2020-12-08 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-12-08 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7004-7005) |
2020-12-08 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 8161. |
2020-12-08 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7004-7007) |
2020-12-08 | House | Ms. Bass moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2020-09-29 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 455. |
2020-09-29 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 116-555. |
2020-09-15 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-09-04 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2020-09-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Adult education and literacy
Congressional oversight
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Crime and law enforcement
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Employment and training programs
Family relationships
Family services
Financial literacy
Health care coverage and access
Higher education
Housing and community development funding
Lawyers and legal services
Licensing and registrations
Mental health
Performance measurement
Public housing
Student aid and college costs
Transportation costs
Congressional oversight
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Crime and law enforcement
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Employment and training programs
Family relationships
Family services
Financial literacy
Health care coverage and access
Higher education
Housing and community development funding
Lawyers and legal services
Licensing and registrations
Mental health
Performance measurement
Public housing
Student aid and college costs
Transportation costs