US HB8132 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Engrossed on September 30 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-09-30 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

American COMPETE Act American Competitiveness Of a More Productive Emerging Tech Economy Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

American COMPETE Act American Competitiveness Of a More Productive Emerging Tech Economy Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-30SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
2020-09-29HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2020-09-29HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4990-4994)
2020-09-29HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 8132.
2020-09-29HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4990-4996)
2020-09-29HouseMr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2020-09-29HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 439.
2020-09-29HouseReported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-539.
2020-09-09HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
2020-09-09HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2020-08-28HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
2020-08-28HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB6937 (Related) 2020-05-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
HB6943 (Related) 2020-05-19 - Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.

Subjects

Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Age discrimination
Aging
Assault and harassment offenses
Aviation and airports
Commerce
Competitiveness, trade promotion, trade deficits
Computer security and identity theft
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Consumer affairs
Crimes against children
Digital media
Domestic violence and child abuse
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Economic performance and conditions
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Food assistance and relief
Food industry and services
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government studies and investigations
Hate crimes
Health technology, devices, supplies
Internet and video services
Labor market
Manufacturing
Materials
Political movements and philosophies
Pornography
Public-private cooperation
Retail and wholesale trades
Sex offenses
Small business
Subversive activities
Terrorism
Transportation safety and security
Unemployment
Violent crime

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback