US HB812 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Passed on June 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-22 - Became Public Law No: 114-178. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Passed on June 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-22 - Became Public Law No: 114-178. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Indian Trust Asset Reform Act TITLE I--RECOGNITION OF TRUST RESPONSIBILITY (Sec. 102) This bill reaffirms the federal government's duty to promote tribal self-determination. TITLE II--INDIAN TRUST ASSET MANAGEMENT DEMONSTRATION PROJECT Indian Trust Asset Management Demonstration Project Act of 2016 (Sec. 203) The Department of the Interior must establish an Indian trust asset management demonstration project that allows tribes to propose Indian trust asset management plans. To be approved by Interior, these plans must establish objectives and priorities for trust assets and allocate sufficient funding for asset management to meet the objectives and priorities. (Sec. 205) Interior may approve a trust asset management plan that allows the Indian tribe to enter into, approve, and carry out a surface leasing transaction or forest land management activity without Interior's approval, under certain conditions. The United States is not liable for losses that result from: (1) a forest land management activity or lease under a trust asset management plan, or (2) management standards under a trust asset management plan that are less-stringent than Interior otherwise requires. TITLE III--IMPROVING EFFICIENCY AND STREAMLINING PROCESSES (Sec. 303) Interior may establish an Under Secretary for Indian Affairs who is to report directly to the Secretary of the Interior and coordinate with the Office of the Special Trustee for American Indians (OST) to ensure an orderly transition of the functions of the OST to an agency or bureau within Interior. (Sec. 304) Interior must prepare a transition plan and timetable for the termination of the OST. (Sec. 305) Appraisals and valuations of Indian trust property must be administered by a single administrative entity within Interior. Interior must establish minimum qualifications for individuals to prepare appraisals and valuations of Indian trust property. An appraisal or valuation by a qualified person is considered final without being reviewed or approved by Interior. (Sec. 306) Representatives of entities that advise Interior on Indian program budget or funding issues may make recommendations regarding the use of savings realized from the transfer of the functions of the OST.
Title
Indian Trust Asset Reform Act
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Simpson [R-ID] | Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] | Rep. Denny Heck [D-WA] | Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] |
Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA] | Rep. Raul Labrador [R-ID] | Rep. David Reichert [R-WA] | Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA] |
Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI] | Rep. Walter Jones [R-NC] | Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] | Rep. Dan Newhouse [R-WA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-22 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 114-178. (TXT | PDF) |
2016-06-22 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2016-06-17 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2016-06-10 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2016-06-10 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3812) |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2016-02-24 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-02-24 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H880-882) |
2016-02-24 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 812. |
2016-02-24 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H879-884) |
2016-02-24 | House | Mr. McClintock moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2016-02-24 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 329. |
2016-02-24 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 114-432. |
2016-02-03 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2016-02-03 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-02-02 | House | Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs Discharged. |
2016-02-02 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-04-14 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2015-03-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs. |
2015-02-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2015-02-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB383 (Related) 2016-02-08 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 364.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Administrative remedies
Alternative dispute resolution, mediation, arbitration
Congressional oversight
Department of the Interior
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal officials
Federal-Indian relations
Forests, forestry, trees
Government information and archives
Indian lands and resources rights
Judicial review and appeals
Land use and conservation
Native Americans
Administrative remedies
Alternative dispute resolution, mediation, arbitration
Congressional oversight
Department of the Interior
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal officials
Federal-Indian relations
Forests, forestry, trees
Government information and archives
Indian lands and resources rights
Judicial review and appeals
Land use and conservation
Native Americans