US HB812 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 59-14)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Agent Orange Equity Act of 2011 - Includes as part of the Republic of Vietnam, for purposes of the presumption of service connection for diseases associated with exposure by veterans to certain herbicide agents while in Vietnam, such Republic's inland waterways, ports, harbors, waters offshore, and airspace. Includes as veterans eligible for such presumption those who: (1) served on Johnston Island during the period beginning on April 1, 1972, and ending on September 30, 1977; or (2) received the Vietnam Service Medal or the Vietnam Campaign Medal.
Title
Agent Orange Equity Act of 2011
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs. |
2011-02-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1629 (Related) 2011-09-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Asia
Conflicts and wars
Disability assistance
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Veterans' pensions and compensation
Vietnam
Asia
Conflicts and wars
Disability assistance
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Veterans' pensions and compensation
Vietnam
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/812/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr812/BILLS-112hr812ih.pdf |