US HB8109 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Introduced on August 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-27 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 462.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-27 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 462.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Restricts the political activities of the members of the Postal Service Board of Governors, including the Postmaster General and the Deputy Postmaster General. Specifically, the bill prohibits (1) the Postmaster General and the Deputy Postmaster General from taking an active part in political management or political campaigns; and (2) the Board of Governors, the Postmaster General, and the Deputy Postmaster General from holding any political position while in office or soliciting funds for the campaign of a candidate for elected office or for a political party. An individual must make certain financial disclosures prior to assuming the duties of Postmaster General or Deputy Postmaster General.
Title
Nonpartisan Postmaster General Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA] | Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] |
Rep. Jimmy Gomez [D-CA] | Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA] | Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] |
Rep. Brenda Lawrence [D-MI] | Rep. Ayanna Pressley [D-MA] | Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL] | Rep. John Sarbanes [D-MD] |
Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA] | Rep. Alexandria Ocasio-Cortez [D-NY] | Rep. Kweisi Mfume [D-MD] | Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] |
Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN] | Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] | Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT] | Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY] |
Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL] | Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY] | Rep. Val Demings [D-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-27 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 462. |
2020-10-27 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Oversight and Reform. H. Rept. 116-564. |
2020-09-16 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2020-09-16 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-08-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform. |
2020-08-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB4561 (Related) 2020-09-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Subjects
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Federal officials
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government operations and politics
Political parties and affiliation
State and local government operations
U.S. Postal Service
Federal officials
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government operations and politics
Political parties and affiliation
State and local government operations
U.S. Postal Service