US HB810 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-13 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-13 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the National Trails System Act to direct the Secretary of the Interior to conduct a study on the feasibility of designating the Chief Standing Bear National Historic Trail, and for other purposes.
Title
To amend the National Trails System Act to direct the Secretary of the Interior to conduct a study on the feasibility of designating the Chief Standing Bear National Historic Trail, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Fortenberry [R-NE] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2021-05-12 | House | Pursuant to section 6 of H. Res. 380, and the motion offered by Mr. Hoyer, the following bills passed under suspension of the rules: H.R. 297; H.R. 433; H.R. 478; H.R. 586; H.R. 721, as amended; H.R. 768; H.R. 810; H.R. 1205; H.R. 1260, as amended; H.R. 1324; H.R. 1448, as amended; H.R. 1475, as amended; H.R. 1480, as amended; H.R. 2862, as amended; H.R. 2955; and H.R. 2981. (consideration: CR H2235-2246; text: CR H2238) |
2021-05-12 | House | Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 380, proceedings on H.R. 810 are considered vacated. |
2021-05-12 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2021-05-12 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 810. |
2021-05-12 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2221-2222) |
2021-05-12 | House | Mr. Soto moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2021-03-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2021-02-04 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2021-02-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR380 (Related) 2021-05-12 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.