US HB8090 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-21 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-21 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To reauthorize funding for the Reclamation Climate Change and Water Program.
Title
To reauthorize funding for the Reclamation Climate Change and Water Program.
Sponsors
Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA] | Rep. Melanie Stansbury [D-NM] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-21 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2022-06-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife. |
2022-06-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2022-06-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB5118 (Related) 2022-08-02 - Received in the Senate.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/8090/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr8090/BILLS-117hr8090ih.pdf |