US HB806 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-10)
Status: Engrossed on September 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-18 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-18 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Consumer Product Safety Commission (CPSC) to require fuel containers to include devices that impede flames from entering the container. This requirement applies to flammable, liquid fuel containers of fewer than five gallons that are intended for transport. CPSC may either promulgate a rule or adopt an existing standard. Additionally, CPSC must educate consumers about dangers associated with using or storing such containers near an open flame or a source of ignition.The bill also requires child resistant caps on kerosene and diesel fuel containers. Currently, this only applies to gasoline containers.
Title
Portable Fuel Container Safety Act of 2019
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
2019-09-17 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-09-17 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7727-7728) |
2019-09-17 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 806. |
2019-09-17 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7727-7729) |
2019-09-17 | House | Ms. Schakowsky moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-09-13 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 164. |
2019-09-13 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-207. |
2019-07-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2019-07-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-07-10 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote . |
2019-07-10 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-06-13 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-01-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Consumer Protection and Commerce. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-01-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1640 (Related) 2020-06-23 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 482.
Subjects
Accidents
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Child health
Child safety and welfare
Commerce
Consumer affairs
Consumer Product Safety Commission
Fires
Motor fuels
Product safety and quality
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Child health
Child safety and welfare
Commerce
Consumer affairs
Consumer Product Safety Commission
Fires
Motor fuels
Product safety and quality