US HB805 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-26 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 440.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Tulare Youth Recreation and Women's History Enhancement Act This bill declares that, in order to promote recreational opportunities for youth and commemorate women's history in the city of Tulare, California, the United States authorizes the conveyance of, and relinquishes its reversionary interest in, specified Tulare Railroad Proposed Parcels that were retained as a right-of-way for the construction of a railroad and telegraph to the Pacific coast in 1866. The relinquishment of the U.S. reversionary interest shall be effective when Union Pacific Railroad conveys the parcels to the city of Tulare.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tulare Youth Recreation and Women's History Enhancement Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-26HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 440.
2018-02-26HouseReported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-579.
2018-01-17HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
2018-01-17HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2018-01-17HouseSubcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged.
2017-12-07HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2017-02-15HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
2017-02-01HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2017-02-01HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback