US HB8023 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on August 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the Board of Regents of the Smithsonian Institution and the Board of Trustees of the National Gallery of Art to construct and use a collections storage space at the Museum Support Center at the Suitland Collections Center in Suitland, Maryland, to accommodate the care, preservation, conservation, storage, and study of national collections held in trust by the Smithsonian Institution and the National Gallery of Art.
Title
Smithsonian and National Gallery of Art Collections Space Authorization Act
Sponsors
Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA] | Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA] | Rep. John Shimkus [R-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management. |
2020-08-11 | House | Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-08-11 | House | Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-08-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB8590 (Related) 2020-10-13 - Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB4925 (Related) 2020-11-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
SB4925 (Related) 2020-11-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
Subjects
Art, artists, authorship
Arts, culture, religion
Maryland
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Smithsonian Institution
Arts, culture, religion
Maryland
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Smithsonian Institution
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/8023/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr8023/BILLS-116hr8023ih.pdf |