US HB8015 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 221-2)
Status: Engrossed on September 8 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-08 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 8 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-08 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the U.S. Postal Service (USPS) from making changes to operations or levels of service from those that were in effect on January 1, 2020, establishes requirements for the processing of election mail, and provides additional funding for the Postal Service Fund. (Sec. 2) Specifically, the USPS may not, during the period beginning on enactment of this bill and ending on the last day of the COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019) public health emergency or January 31, 2021, whichever is later, implement or approve any change to the operations or the level of service that would reduce service performance or impede prompt, reliable, and efficient services. Such changes include the following: changes in the nature of services that will generally affect service on a nationwide basis; revisions of service standards; closures or consolidations of post offices or facilities or reduction of hours; prohibitions or restrictions on the use of overtime or payment of overtime pay to USPS officers or employees; changes that would prevent the USPS from meeting its service standards or that would reduce measurements of performance concerning those standards; changes that would have the effect of delaying, deferring, or curtailing mail, allowing non-delivery to a delivery route, or increasing the volume of undelivered mail; treating election mail as any class of mail other than first-class mail, regardless of whether this requires overtime pay; any removal or stoppage of mail sorting machines, other than for routine maintenance; removing or eliminating any mail collection box available to the public; enacting any rule, policy, or standard the purpose or effect of which would delay delivery of mail to or from a government entity; and instituting any hiring freeze. The USPS shall reverse any initiative or action that is causing delay in processing or delivery or non-delivery of mail. With regard to election mail specifically, the bill (1) establishes USPS policy to postmark, with imprinted indicia of the date of receipt, all processed election mail; and (2) directs the USPS to ensure that election mail is processed and cleared from any postal facility on the same day it is received. The term election mail means voter registration materials, absentee and other mail-in applications and ballots, and other materials mailed by state or local election officials to individuals registered to vote in the election. (Sec. 3) The bill appropriates $25 billion as an additional payment to the Postal Service Fund, of which $15 million shall be transferred to the USPS Office of Inspector General.
Title
Delivering for America Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-22 - House - On passage (Y: 257 N: 150 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2020-08-22 - House - On motion to recommit with instructions (Y: 182 N: 223 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [FAIL]
2020-08-22 - House - On motion to recommit with instructions (Y: 182 N: 223 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-08 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2020-08-22 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-08-22 | House | On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 257 - 150 (Roll no. 182). (text: CR H4271) |
2020-08-22 | House | On motion to recommit with instructions Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 182 - 223 (Roll no. 181). |
2020-08-22 | House | The previous question on the motion to recommit with instructions was ordered without objection. |
2020-08-22 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Comer motion to recommit with instructions. The instructions contained in the motion seek to require the bill to be reported back to the House with an amendment to add language to establish penalties for Postal Service employees who are found guilty of tampering with a Federal election. |
2020-08-22 | House | Mr. Comer moved to recommit with instructions to the Committee on Appropriations. (text: CR H4296) |
2020-08-22 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. |
2020-08-22 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with two hour of debate on H.R. 8015. |
2020-08-22 | House | Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 8015 with 2 hours of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments. |
2020-08-22 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 1092. (consideration: CR H4256-4298) |
2020-08-22 | House | Rule H. Res. 1092 passed House. |
2020-08-22 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 1092 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 8015 with 2 hours of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments. |
2020-08-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform. |
2020-08-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR1092 (Related) 2020-08-22 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB4527 (Related) 2020-08-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
SB4585 (Related) 2020-09-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB8607 (Related) 2020-10-16 - Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committees on House Administration, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB4527 (Related) 2020-08-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
SB4585 (Related) 2020-09-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB8607 (Related) 2020-10-16 - Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committees on House Administration, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Appropriations
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Employee hiring
Executive agency funding and structure
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government operations and politics
Government studies and investigations
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Performance measurement
Postal service
State and local government operations
U.S. Postal Service
Wages and earnings
Appropriations
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Employee hiring
Executive agency funding and structure
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government operations and politics
Government studies and investigations
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Performance measurement
Postal service
State and local government operations
U.S. Postal Service
Wages and earnings