US HB7988 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-9)
Status: Engrossed on December 13 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-13 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 13 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-13 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 79125 Corporate Centre Drive in La Quinta, California, as the "Corporal Hunter Lopez Memorial Post Office Building".
Title
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 79125 Corporate Centre Drive in La Quinta, California, as the "Corporal Hunter Lopez Memorial Post Office Building".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2022-12-12 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-12-12 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9664) |
2022-12-12 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 7988. |
2022-12-12 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9664-9665) |
2022-12-12 | House | Mrs. Maloney, Carolyn B. moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2022-11-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2022-11-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-09-20 | House | Request to order reported by unanimous consent failed. |
2022-09-20 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-06-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform. |
2022-06-08 | House | Introduced in House |