US HB796 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Savings Through Security Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Savings Through Security Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-05HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
2019-02-13HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Border Security, Facilitation, and Operations.
2019-02-12HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2019-01-28HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2019-01-25HouseReferred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, the Judiciary, Homeland Security, Agriculture, Ways and Means, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-01-25HouseReferred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, the Judiciary, Homeland Security, Agriculture, Ways and Means, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-01-25HouseReferred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, the Judiciary, Homeland Security, Agriculture, Ways and Means, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-01-25HouseReferred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, the Judiciary, Homeland Security, Agriculture, Ways and Means, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-01-25HouseReferred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, the Judiciary, Homeland Security, Agriculture, Ways and Means, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-01-25HouseReferred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, the Judiciary, Homeland Security, Agriculture, Ways and Means, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-01-25HouseReferred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, the Judiciary, Homeland Security, Agriculture, Ways and Means, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-01-25HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback