US HB7932 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-04 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Pending: House Education and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-04 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Pending: House Education and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Department of Labor, in collaboration with the Department of Education, to award competitive grants, contracts, or cooperative agreements to community colleges to establish and scale career training programs, establish industry and sector partnerships, and provide student support services. Labor must give priority to community colleges that will use funds to serve individuals who are impacted by the COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019) national emergency.
Title
Community College Workforce Training Act
Sponsors
Rep. Suzanne Lee [D-NV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-04 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor. |
2020-08-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB6646 (Related) 2020-05-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
SB3659 (Related) 2020-05-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB4112 (Related) 2020-06-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB3659 (Related) 2020-05-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB4112 (Related) 2020-06-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Alaska Natives and Hawaiians
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Community life and organization
Disability assistance
Economic development
Education
Education of the disadvantaged
Education programs funding
Educational technology and distance education
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Employment and training programs
Higher education
Indian social and development programs
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Labor-management relations
Licensing and registrations
Minority education
Minority employment
Poverty and welfare assistance
Rural conditions and development
Student aid and college costs
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Unemployment
Vocational and technical education
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Community life and organization
Disability assistance
Economic development
Education
Education of the disadvantaged
Education programs funding
Educational technology and distance education
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Employment and training programs
Higher education
Indian social and development programs
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Labor-management relations
Licensing and registrations
Minority education
Minority employment
Poverty and welfare assistance
Rural conditions and development
Student aid and college costs
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Unemployment
Vocational and technical education
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/7932/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr7932/BILLS-116hr7932ih.pdf |