US HB7913 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 31 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-31 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Pending: House Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 31 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-31 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Pending: House Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extends the time period during which a financial institution may suspend certain determinations and accounting principles for loan modifications related to the COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019) pandemic that would otherwise be categorized as a troubled debt restructuring for reporting purposes. Specifically, the bill extends this period to March 1, 2021. Currently, this period expires on the earlier of the date 60 days after the expiration of the emergency declaration or December 31, 2020. Additionally, if a depository institution elects to suspend these requirements, the appropriate supervisory banking agency is generally prohibited, until April 1, 2022, from requiring these loans to be classified as impaired for credit risk purposes.
Title
Financial Institution Forbearance Act
Sponsors
Rep. Blaine Luetkemeyer [R-MO] | Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-31 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2020-07-31 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Accounting and auditing
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Credit and credit markets
Economic performance and conditions
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Finance and financial sector
Financial crises and stabilization
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Credit and credit markets
Economic performance and conditions
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Finance and financial sector
Financial crises and stabilization
Infectious and parasitic diseases
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/7913/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr7913/BILLS-116hr7913ih.pdf |