US HB7903 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 117-237.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 117-237.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To designate the Department of Veterans Affairs community-based outpatient clinic in Canton, Michigan, as the "Major General Oliver W. Dillard VA Outpatient Clinic".
Title
To designate the Department of Veterans Affairs community-based outpatient clinic located in Canton, Michigan, as the "Major General Oliver W. Dillard VA Clinic".
Sponsors
Rep. Haley Stevens [D-MI] | Rep. Jack Bergman [R-MI] | Rep. Bill Huizenga [R-MI] | Rep. Peter Meijer [R-MI] |
Rep. John Moolenaar [R-MI] | Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI] | Rep. Fred Upton [R-MI] | Rep. Tim Walberg [R-MI] |
Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI] | Rep. Andy Levin [D-MI] | Rep. Lisa McClain [R-MI] | Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] |
Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI] | Rep. Brenda Lawrence [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-20 | House | Became Public Law No: 117-237. |
2022-12-20 | House | Signed by President. |
2022-12-16 | House | Presented to President. |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2022-12-06 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7008) |
2022-12-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2022-11-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2022-11-14 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2022-11-14 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-11-14 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8452) |
2022-11-14 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 7903. |
2022-11-14 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8452-8455) |
2022-11-14 | House | Mr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2022-06-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. |
2022-05-27 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2022-05-27 | House | Introduced in House |