US HB790 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-31 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-31 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Increases by 2.6% the rates of basic pay for federal civilian employees for 2019.
Title
Federal Civilian Workforce Pay Raise Fairness Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Steny Hoyer [D-MD] | Rep. Elijah Cummings [D-MD] | Rep. David Trone [D-MD] |
Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] | Rep. John Sarbanes [D-MD] | Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA] | Rep. Jennifer Wexton [D-VA] |
Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT] | Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA] |
Rep. C.A. Ruppersberger [D-MD] | Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA] |
Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO] | Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] | Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] | Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH] |
Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Donald Norcross [D-NJ] | Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO] |
Rep. Al Green [D-TX] | Rep. Steven Horsford [D-NV] | Rep. Gregorio Sablan [D-MP] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-30 - House - On passage RC# 64 (Y: 259 N: 161 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - On motion to recommit with instructions RC# 63 (Y: 206 N: 216 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-30 - House - On agreeing to the Trahan amendment (A003) H.Amdt.19 RC# 62 (Y: 243 N: 183 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - On motion to recommit with instructions RC# 63 (Y: 206 N: 216 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-30 - House - On agreeing to the Trahan amendment (A003) H.Amdt.19 RC# 62 (Y: 243 N: 183 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-31 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2019-01-30 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-01-30 | House | On passage Passed by recorded vote: 259 - 161 (Roll no. 64). |
2019-01-30 | House | On motion to recommit with instructions Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 206 - 216 (Roll no. 63). |
2019-01-30 | House | The previous question on the motion to recommit with instructions was ordered without objection. |
2019-01-30 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Brooks of Indiana motion to recommit with instructions. The instructions contained in the motion seek to require the bill to be reported back to the House with an amendment to add at the end of the bill a new section pertaining to the Prohibition on Pay Adjustment for Employees Disciplined for Sexual Misconduct. |
2019-01-30 | House | Mrs. Brooks (IN) moved to recommit with instructions to the Committee on Oversight and Reform. (text: CR H1314) |
2019-01-30 | House | The House adopted the amendment as agreed to by the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union. (text: CR H1304) |
2019-01-30 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. |
2019-01-30 | House | The House rose from the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union to report H.R. 790. |
2019-01-30 | House | H.Amdt.19 On agreeing to the Trahan amendment (A003) Agreed to by recorded vote: 243 - 183 (Roll no. 62). |
2019-01-30 | House | The House resolved into Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union for further consideration. |
2019-01-30 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1313-1316) |
2019-01-30 | House | Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union rises leaving H.R. 790 as unfinished business. |
2019-01-30 | House | On motion that the committee rise Agreed to by voice vote. |
2019-01-30 | House | Mr. Connolly moved that the committee rise. |
2019-01-30 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Trahan amendment, the Chair put the question on agreeing to the amendment and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Meadows demanded a recorded vote and the Chair postponed further proceedings on agreeing to the amendment until a time to be announced. |
2019-01-30 | House | DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 87, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Trahan amendment No. 3. |
2019-01-30 | House | H.Amdt.19 Amendment (A003) offered by Mrs. Trahan. (consideration: CR H1305-1306, H1313-1314; text: CR H1305) |
2019-01-30 | House | H.Amdt.18 On agreeing to the Fletcher amendment (A002) Agreed to by voice vote. |
2019-01-30 | House | DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 87, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Fletcher amendment No. 2. |
2019-01-30 | House | H.Amdt.18 Amendment (A002) offered by Mrs. Fletcher. (consideration: CR H1305; text: CR H1305) |
2019-01-30 | House | H.Amdt.17 On agreeing to the Trone amendment (A001) Agreed to by voice vote. |
2019-01-30 | House | DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 87, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Trone amendment No. 1. |
2019-01-30 | House | H.Amdt.17 Amendment (A001) offered by Mr. Trone. (consideration: CR H1304-1305; text: CR H1304-1305) |
2019-01-30 | House | GENERAL DEBATE - The Committee of the Whole proceeded with one hour of general debate on H.R. 790. |
2019-01-30 | House | The Speaker designated the Honorable Gregorio Kilili Camacho Sablan to act as Chairman of the Committee. |
2019-01-30 | House | House resolved itself into the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union pursuant to H. Res. 87 and Rule XVIII. |
2019-01-30 | House | Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 790 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be considered read. Specified amendments are in order. The resolution provides for suspension authority through the legislative day of February 8, 2019. |
2019-01-30 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 87. (consideration: CR H1295-1306) |
2019-01-30 | House | Rule H. Res. 87 passed House. |
2019-01-29 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 87 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 790 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be considered read. Specified amendments are in order. The resolution provides for suspension authority through the legislative day of February 8, 2019. |
2019-01-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform. |
2019-01-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR87 (Related) 2019-01-30 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB1073 (Related) 2019-02-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
HB782 (Related) 2019-01-24 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
HB790 (Related) 2019-01-31 - Received in the Senate.
SB262 (Related) 2019-01-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
SB426 (Related) 2019-02-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB1073 (Related) 2019-02-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
HB782 (Related) 2019-01-24 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
HB790 (Related) 2019-01-31 - Received in the Senate.
SB262 (Related) 2019-01-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
SB426 (Related) 2019-02-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.